U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00364
  • Case Name: Fitil v. City of Omaha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Summons Requested]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • October 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.