U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 17.1 Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • April 22, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Objection To Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 13, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 13, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • December 14, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • December 14, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • November 16, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • November 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.