U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03267
  • Case Name: Kohrell v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC et al (TV1)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Strike Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Attorney Letter]
  • December 21, 2022: [Remark - Public (Related Case)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.