U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03268
  • Case Name: Biglari v. University of Nebraska Lincoln et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Extend]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2022: [Attorney Letter]
  • December 22, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • December 21, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • December 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • December 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.