U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00443
  • Case Name: Wright v. City of Omaha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 13, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 05, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency (No Signature)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.