U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00131
  • Case Name: BJ's Fleet Wash v. City of Omaha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [In Court Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extend]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.