U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Gulick v. Carson Group Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Certificate]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Email Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Email]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.