U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Carter v. Frakes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Settlement Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • September 27, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.