U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zamfir et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Upward Departure]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Upward Departure]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 10, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Upward Departure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Index]
  • April 10, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Extend]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 11, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Audio File]
  • September 26, 2024: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • September 26, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.