U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00287
  • Case Name: GD Concrete Construction, Inc. v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Summons Requested]
  • October 14, 2024: [Reply to Counterclaim]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2024: [Summons Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.