U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Coleman v. Jeffreys
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Extend]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Amend]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.