U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • March 18, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 02, 2024: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 02, 2024: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Letter]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Audio File]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.