U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Gibson v. Burlington Capital PM Group, INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Regarding No Certificate of Compliance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2024: [Certificate]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Certificate]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.