U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03051
  • Case Name: Rushman v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Returned Mail]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Returned Mail]
  • October 02, 2024: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • October 01, 2024: [Declaration]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Default Judgment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.