U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00416
  • Case Name: The United States of America v. General Dynamics Corporation, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Disclosure Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.