U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00108-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 15, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 15, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • March 31, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 31, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 31, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.