U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Hallman v. Flagship Restaurant Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 30, 2024: [Brief]
  • September 30, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 30, 2024: [Strike]
  • September 27, 2024: [Brief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.