U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Roach v. Navsav Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Index]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Email]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 26, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2024: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • October 01, 2024: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Opinion (Copy) of USCA]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.