U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Almond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Index]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 27, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.