U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 31, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Transcript - Unredacted]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 30, 2024: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.