U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 02, 2025: [Audio File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • October 04, 2024: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • October 04, 2024: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 04, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Trial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.