U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorfmeyer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • May 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.