U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Bundy v. Loup Valley Rural Public Power District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • May 08, 2025: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • May 08, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 30, 2024: [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.