U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-03097
  • Case Name: Krajewski v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Response]
  • October 15, 2024: [Index]
  • October 04, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Strike]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extend]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Index]
  • September 30, 2024: [Reply Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.