U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03060-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Titman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Email Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 01, 2024: [Email]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.