U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Lazo v. TOHVT Motors, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.