U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00351
  • Case Name: Savista, LLC v. GS Labs, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 02, 2024: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.