U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Clark v. Pillen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Copy of Order from USCA]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • October 07, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.