U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Pennsylvania Insurance Company v. Federal Express Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Letter]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Bill of Costs]
  • April 28, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2024: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.