U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00215-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Alejandro Muniz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Index]
  • April 28, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 24, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 18, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 18, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • January 16, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.