U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03177
  • Case Name: Jim Daws Trucking, LLC v. Daws, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Request for Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Interlocutory Appeal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request for Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Index]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Index]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Receipt (Bond)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Redaction Request]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 13, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Index]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Proposed Exhibit List]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2024: [Summons Requested]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 02, 2024: [Assignment of Judges]
  • October 02, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.