U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03059-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 30, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 30, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 30, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Index]
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Audio File]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 08, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 03, 2024: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Audio File]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.