U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parent et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 03, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.