U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vittitoe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.