U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00349
  • Case Name: Batoka v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Index]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exclude]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Certificate]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.