U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-03205
  • Case Name: Akins v. Sysco Lincoln Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Index]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Index]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Audio File]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.