U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Donlin v. Hall County Livestock Improvement Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Email]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extend]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Disclosure Document]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.