U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Evnen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Letter]
  • October 07, 2024: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.