U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00101-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez Quinones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.