U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • October 07, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.