U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03149
  • Case Name: Commonwealth Electric Company of the Midwest v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Index]
  • April 09, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.