U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Muhammad v. Jeffreys
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Mandate/Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Mandate/Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.