U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Christianson v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 30, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 30, 2025: [Index]
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.