U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03021-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Velez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Index]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Tentative Findings of Fact]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Email]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 28, 2025: [Index]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.