U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Prestby et al v. A&A Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.