U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.