U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-03041
  • Case Name: DeGroot v. Nebraska Book Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extend]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Email]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2024: [Declaration]
  • October 08, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.