U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00225-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Grigsby et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 26, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
November, 2024
  • November 28, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.