U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03072-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Westgate et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 23, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 02, 2025: [Strike Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Rule 5 Pleadings - In]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extend]
  • October 09, 2024: [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.