U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00291
  • Case Name: The Beckmark Farm, LLC et al v. Platte Valley Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2025: [Index]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Index]
  • March 17, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Audio File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.